HB1017 (CH0024)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Personnel – Collective Bargaining – Exclusive Representative Access to New Employee Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Korman

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24


Synopsis:Requiring the Department of Budget and Management, University System of Maryland system institutions, Morgan State University, St. Mary's College of Maryland, and Baltimore City Community College to provide certain information on certain employees to certain exclusive representatives within 30 days of a new employee's date of hire; requiring an exclusive representative to withhold certain communication with an employee on the written request of the employee with certain exceptions; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Korman, B. Barnes, Haynes, Jones, Krimm, McIntosh, Reznik, Sophocleus, Tarlau, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0677
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingFinance
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Personnel
Narrow Subject(s):Agents and Brokers
Budget and Management, Department of
Collective Bargaining
Community Colleges
Communications -see also- Electronic Comm; Language; Telecom
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Notices
Personal Representatives
Postal Service
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
State Employees
State Universities and Colleges
Time
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(3-208, 3-2A-08, 3-502, 3-307)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 1:39 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20182/7/2018First Reading Appropriations
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 2/23 at 2:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {994869/1 Report Adopted44
Special Order until next session (Delegate Shoemaker) Adopted 44
3/14/20183/11/2018Floor Amendment {353722/1 (Delegate Krebs) Adopted45
Floor Amendment {653024/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-87)45
Floor Amendment {513427/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-86)45
Floor Amendment {203220/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (47-87)45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (87-48)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48A
3/22/20183/22/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/22/20183/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted51
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 51
3/23/20183/21/2018Floor Amendment {283524/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted (45-0)52
Floor Amendment {373422/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31)52
Floor Amendment {253624/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (15-30)52
Floor Amendment {413823/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (14-31)52
Floor Amendment {463421/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-30)52
Second Reading Passed with Amendments52
3/26/20183/22/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (33-14)53
House3/28/20183/21/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments55
Third Reading Passed (90-49)55
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 24

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 4:08 P.M.