HB1072 (CH0031)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Child Sexual Abuse Prevention - Instruction and Training

Sponsored by:

Delegate Wilson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31


Synopsis:Requiring a county board of education or a nonpublic school that receives State funds to require each employee to receive annual training on the prevention, identification, and reporting of child sexual abuse; authorizing the instruction and training to include information to help employees recognize and respond to incidents of sexual misconduct; requiring the Interagency Committee on School Construction and the State Council on Child Abuse to develop best practices to reduce opportunities for child sexual abuse; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Wilson, Angel, Impallaria, McComas, McDonough, Metzgar, Morgan, Rosenberg, Saab, K. Young, Kaiser, Turner, Ali, D. Barnes, Buckel, Hornberger, C. Howard, Long, Luedtke, Mosby, Patterson, Rose, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Walker, M. Washington, and Wilkins
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Child Abuse and Neglect
Continuing Education -see also- Job Training
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Governor
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Local Government Mandates
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Sexual Offenses
Students
Teachers
Volunteers -see also- Maryland Service Corps
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Education
(6-113, 6-113.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 4:33 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20182/7/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {375369/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48B
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 31

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:58 P.M.