HB1076

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Transit Administration - Station Safety Pilot Program

Sponsored by:

Anne Arundel County Delegation

Status:

In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Establishing the Maryland Transit Administration Station Pilot Program to provide law enforcement officers at transit stations to enhance public safety; requiring a law enforcement officer to be on duty during certain hours; requiring the Administration to implement the pilot program at certain transit stations under its jurisdiction; requiring the Governor to provide funds for the Program in the State budget; requiring by December 1, 2019, the Administration to submit a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Anne Arundel County Delegation
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Transportation - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Communications -see also- Electronic Comm; Language; Telecom
Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads
Reports
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Transportation, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(7-711)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 11:42 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20182/7/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20183/17/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {730914/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
3/20/20183/20/2018Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 20, 2018 11:30 A.M.