HB1081

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Miller, A.

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Establishing the Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours certification within the State Department of Education beginning in the 2016-2017 school year; providing that the purpose of the Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours certification is to recognize local school systems that create, implement, and enforce school start times that are consistent with the school start times recommended by the Department, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, and the American Academy of Pediatrics; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates A. Miller, Afzali, Carr, C. Howard, Jalisi, Kelly, Korman, McMillan, Moon, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Waldstreicher, C. Wilson, Ebersole, Hornberger, and Tarlau
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Health -see also- Mental Health
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Notices
Public Information
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Time
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-121)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:45 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/13/20152/13/2015First Reading Ways and Means
2/18/20152/18/2015Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
3/23/20153/23/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/23/20153/21/2015Favorable with Amendments {785460/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/24/20153/22/2015Third Reading Passed (124-14)52
Senate3/25/20153/22/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs49
3/26/20153/26/2015Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
4/9/20154/9/2015Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:45 P.M.