HB1083 (CH0028)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health - Family Planning Services - Continuity of Care

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pendergrass

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28


Synopsis:Establishing the Family Planning Program in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to ensure the continuity of family planning services in the State; requiring the Program to provide family planning services to specified individuals through specified providers; authorizing the Department to adopt specified regulations; requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to ensure access to and continuity of services provided by specified family planning providers in a specified manner; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Pendergrass, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Bromwell, Brooks, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Sophocleus, Stein, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, C. Wilson, K. Young, and Mosby
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1081
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Continuing Care -see also- Long-Term Care; Nursing Homes
Federal Government
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Reproductive Matters -see also- Abortion; Birth Control
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(15-101, 15-102.1, 13-3401, 13-3402)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2017 12:32 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20172/9/2017First Reading Health and Government Operations
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20173/6/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/14/20173/11/2017Favorable with Amendments {856381/1 Report Adopted45
Floor Amendment {683224/1 (Delegate Simonaire) Rejected (47-89)45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/16/20173/13/2017Third Reading Passed (90-51)47
Senate3/17/20173/17/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation46
3/23/20173/23/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/24/20173/24/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/24/20173/22/2017Favorable51
Special Order until 3/27 (Senator Hough) Adopted 51
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable Report Adopted52
Floor Amendment {833927/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-30)52
Floor Amendment {263322/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (14-32)52
Floor Amendment {663825/1 (Senator Hough) Rejected (15-31)52
Floor Amendment {423027/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-31)52
Floor Amendment {713928/1 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected (15-31)52
Second Reading Passed52
3/28/20173/24/2017Floor Amendment {493721/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (15-32)53
Third Reading Passed (32-15)53
House3/28/20173/24/2017Returned Passed58
Post Passage4/6/20174/6/2017Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 5, 2017 9:11 A.M.