HB1090 (CH0515)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Consumer Protection - Caller ID Spoofing Ban of 2018

Sponsored by:

Delegate Afzali

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515


Synopsis:Prohibiting an individual or a person from taking certain actions to provide false location information when placing a telephone call with the intent to defraud, harass, cause harm, or wrongfully obtain anything of value; providing for the application of the Act; and establishing a certain penalty for providing false location information when placing a call.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Afzali
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Utility Regulation
Narrow Subject(s):Consumer Protection -see also- Unfair Trade Practices
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Fraud -see also- Forgery
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Unfair Trade Practices
Statutes:Article - Commercial Law
(13-301, 13-401, 13-408, 14-1326)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 4:29 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20182/7/2018First Reading Economic Matters
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/8/20183/8/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {923594/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/14/20183/11/2018Third Reading Passed (134-0)45
Senate3/15/20183/15/2018First Reading Finance47
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/6/20184/6/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/6/20184/1/2018Favorable with Amendments {857677/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/9/20184/2/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)64
House4/9/20184/2/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (140-0)67
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:34 P.M.