HB1092 (CH0209)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program – Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Rosenberg

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209


Synopsis:Establishing the Behavioral Health Crisis Response Grant Program to provide funds to local jurisdictions to establish and expand community behavioral health crisis response systems; requiring that, for certain fiscal years, the Governor include in the budget bill certain appropriations for the Program; authorizing certain uses of funds distributed under the Program; requiring the Department, by December 1 each year, beginning in 2020, to report to the Governor and the General Assembly certain data regarding the Program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Rosenberg, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Miele, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Sample-Hughes, K. Young, A. Miller, Morhaim, Pendergrass, and Szeliga
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0703
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Appropriations
Finance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Emergency Medical Services
Governor
Grants
Health, Department of
Jurisdiction
Mental and Behavioral Health
Reports
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(7.5-208)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 27, 2018 12:54 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20182/7/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
3/17/20183/17/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {966986/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (133-5)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {547278/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)58
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (131-4)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.