HB1095

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Prekindergarten Programs - Notification of Eligibility by Local Departments of Social Services

Sponsored by:

Delegate Platt

Status:

Veto sustained (0-135)


Synopsis:Requiring specified local departments of social services and specified local health departments, under specified circumstances, to provide specified parents or guardians with an oral and written notice that their child may be eligible for publicly funded prekindergarten programs; requiring specified local departments of social services and specified local health departments to report annually to the General Assembly on the number of parents who were given a notification and who subsequently enrolled their child in the specified program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Platt, Luedtke, Barkley, D. Barnes, Buckel, Carr, Clippinger, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Hayes, Hettleman, Hornberger, C. Howard, Kaiser, Korman, Lierman, McCray, Metzgar, Moon, Morales, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Reilly, Reznik, S. Robinson, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0369
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Education - Miscellaneous
Children
Narrow Subject(s):Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Guardians
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Notices
Public Information
Public Schools
Social Services -see also- Welfare
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-101.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/11/20162/11/2016First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20162/12/2016Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20163/16/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/14/2016Favorable with Amendments {215863/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/18/20163/16/2016Third Reading Passed (140-0)48
Senate3/21/20163/18/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47A
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/20163/31/2016Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20164/1/2016Third Reading Passed (44-0)61A
House4/7/20164/1/2016Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/27/20165/27/2016Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
House1/17/20171/17/2017Veto sustained (0-135)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:04 P.M.