HB1109 (CH0005)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems - County Boards of Education Payments

Sponsored by:

Delegate Barnes, B.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5


Synopsis:Providing that, for fiscal year 2017, county boards of education shall be relieved of a specified portion of a contribution for specified local employees of the Teachers' Retirement and Pension Systems; providing for a specified allocation of payment relief; requiring the Governor to provide a specified amount in either fiscal year 2018 or 2019 to be paid into specified accumulation funds of the State Retirement and Pension System if a specified condition is not met; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate B. Barnes
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1001
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingBudget and Taxation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Pensions and Retirement
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Governor
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Teachers
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20172/9/2017First Reading Appropriations
2/15/20172/15/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/10/20173/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/13/20173/10/2017Favorable with Amendments {934664/1 Report Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/15/20173/12/2017Third Reading Passed (139-1)46
Senate3/16/20173/16/2017First Reading Budget and Taxation45
3/21/20173/21/2017Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
3/27/20173/23/2017Favorable Report Adopted52
Second Reading Passed52
3/28/20173/24/2017Third Reading Passed (33-14)53
House3/28/20173/24/2017Returned Passed58
Post Passage3/31/20173/31/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:05 P.M.