HB1131

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Expansion of Participating Units

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring that, on the termination of any health benefits contract that exists on July 1, 2018, a county, municipal corporation, or county board must enroll and participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; requiring the Program to encompass all units in all county governments, municipal corporations, and county boards; requiring the Secretary of Budget and Management to adopt certain regulations specifying certain employees who are eligible to participate in the Program with certain subsidies; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Morhaim
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1016
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Appropriations
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Personnel
Local Government - Generally
Municipalities
Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Insurance Administration
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
State Employees
Sunset
Statutes:Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(2-501, 2-502, 2-503, 2-507, 2-512, 2-513)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 28, 2018 1:18 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20182/8/2018First Reading Appropriations
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
3/1/20183/1/2018Hearing canceled
3/5/20183/5/2018Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 2, 2018 1:31 P.M.