HB1145 (CH0730)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public School Employee Whistleblower Protection Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Tarlau

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730


Synopsis:Prohibiting a public school employer from taking or refusing to take specified personnel actions as a reprisal against public school employees who disclose specified behavior; providing that specified protections under the Act apply only if specified employees have a good faith belief that the employer is engaged or has engaged in unlawful activity which poses a danger to public health or safety; requiring a public school employee to exhaust all administrative remedies before instituting a specified civil action; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Tarlau, Angel, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Fennell, Frush, Hayes, C. Howard, Luedtke, Morales, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Sanchez, Shoemaker, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, Ali, and Afzali
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
State Government - Personnel
Narrow Subject(s):Baltimore City
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Disclosure
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(6-901 through 6-906)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20172/9/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {145266/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (139-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/20/2017Reassigned to Finance49
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/7/20174/7/2017Favorable Report by Finance
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Special Order until 10:00 pm (Senator Ready) Adopted 63A
Third Reading Passed (36-0)63A
House4/10/20174/5/2017Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 730

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:05 P.M.