HB1161 (CH0671)

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Commission on Special Education Access and Equity

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, A.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671


Synopsis:Establishing the Commission on Special Education Access and Equity; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; and requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2014.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates A. Washington, Afzali, Branch, Clippinger, George, Hixson, Howard, Ivey, Kaiser, Luedtke, McConkey, A. Miller, Summers, Waldstreicher, Walker, Barve, Boteler, Cardin, Fisher, Frick, Harper, Myers, Serafini, Stukes, and F. Turner
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, State Department of
Reports
Special Education
Students
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/21/20133/21/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/21/20133/18/2013Favorable with Amendments {935664/1 Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed with Amendments51
3/23/20133/20/2013Third Reading Passed (135-0)53
Senate3/25/20133/21/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs52
3/26/20133/26/2013Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20134/5/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20134/1/2013Favorable with Amendments {314437/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/8/20134/2/2013Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)64
House4/8/20134/3/2013House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (136-1)67
Passed Enrolled67
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Approved by the Governor - Chapter 671

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.