HB1164 (CH0246)

Find a 2014 Bill:

2014 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland College and Career-Ready Standards and Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Implementation Review Workgroup

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246


Synopsis:Establishing the Maryland College and Career-Ready Standards and Partnership for Assessment of Readiness for College and Careers (PARCC) Implementation Review Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to assess specified needs, design specified plans, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Workgroup to submit a final report of its findings to the Governor, the State Board of Education and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Luedtke, Barkley, Barnes, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Harper, Haynes, Hixson, Kaiser, Lafferty, Lee, Morhaim, Oaks, Olszewski, S. Robinson, Zucker, A. Miller, Walker, and A. Washington
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Ways and Means   View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs   View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Emergency Bills
Job Training
Public Schools
Reports
Students
Sunset
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/7/20142/7/2014First Reading Ways and Means
2/10/20142/10/2014Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20143/14/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20143/11/2014Favorable with Amendments {365069/3 Report Adopted47
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted 47
3/15/20143/12/2014Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {643024/3 Rejected (42-85)48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/17/20143/13/2014Third Reading Passed (127-8)49
Senate3/18/20143/13/2014First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs47
3/19/20143/19/2014Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
3/31/20143/31/2014Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/20143/23/2014Favorable with Amendments {774133/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/2/20143/24/2014Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1)58
House4/4/20143/28/2014House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments64
House Requests Senate Recede64
Conference Committee Appointed64
Delegates A. Washington, Serafini, and Kaiser64
Senate4/5/20143/27/2014Senate Refuses to Recede61
Conference Committee Appointed61
Senators Pinsky, Benson, and Jennings61
House4/7/20144/1/2014Conference Committee Report Adopted68
Third Reading Passed (137-0)68
Senate4/7/20143/30/2014Conference Committee Report Adopted64
Third Reading Passed (46-1)64
House4/7/20144/1/2014Passed Enrolled64
Post Passage4/14/20144/14/2014Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:53 P.M.