HB1168

2013 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Minority Teacher Recruitment - Study and Report

Sponsored by:

Delegate Hixson

Status:

Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education, the Maryland Higher Education Commission, and the University System of Maryland to study and make recommendations on strategies to increase and improve minority teacher recruitment, preparation, development, and retention in elementary and secondary education in the State; requiring the Department, Commission, and System jointly to submit a specified report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Hixson
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0548
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Education, State Department of
Higher Education Commission
Minorities -see also- Women
Public Schools
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20132/8/2013First Reading Ways and Means
2/13/20132/13/2013Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/13/20133/13/2013Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20133/14/2013Favorable with Amendments {485360/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20133/16/2013Third Reading Passed (137-2)49
Senate3/20/20133/18/2013First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs49
4/4/20134/4/2013Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20133/31/2013Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/5/20134/1/2013Third Reading Passed (44-0)63
House4/6/20134/1/2013Returned Passed65
Post Passage5/16/20135/16/2013Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 1:05 P.M.