HB1216 (CH0694)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Career Preparation Expansion Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Clippinger

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694


Synopsis:Authorizing a student or a student's parent or guardian to release the student's Armed Services Vocational Aptitude Battery score to certain apprenticeship programs and certain employers; authorizing the State Department of Education to adopt regulations requiring the award of credit toward high school graduation for time spent in certain apprenticeship programs; authorizing a Workforce Development Sequence Scholarship to assist with the cost of participation in certain apprenticeship programs; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Clippinger
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0978
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Economic Matters  View Committee Hearing
Ways and Means
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Finance
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Narrow Subject(s):Apprentices
Armed Forces -see also- Military Department; Veterans
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Credit
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Disclosure
Education, State Department of
Health, Department of
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Industry and Technology
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Notices
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Privacy
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Education
(18-3301, 18-3302, 18-3303, 18-3304, 24-702, 7-111, 7-205.1, 11-1401 through 11-1406, 21-205)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 18, 2018 4:10 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/8/20182/8/2018First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means
2/21/20182/21/2018Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
3/6/20183/6/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
4/6/20184/6/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
4/6/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments {233991/1 Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63
4/7/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (126-12)64
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018First Reading Senate Rules64
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/20184/5/2018Favorable Report Adopted67
Second Reading Passed67
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted67
Third Reading Passed (46-0)67
House4/10/20184/5/2018Returned Passed70
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 694

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.