HB1240 (CH0715)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Individualized Education Programs - Studies

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kaiser

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with each local school system, to review and assess specified staff allocations related to the participation of children with disabilities in the individualized education program process, the geographic population density of specified children and special education teachers, and recommend resource allocation to effectively assist the parents and guardians of children with disabilities; requiring the Department to report to the General Assembly by July 1, 2019; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Kaiser, A. Washington, Atterbeary, Ebersole, Frick, Haynes, Healey, Hill, Jalisi, Korman, Krimm, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McComas, Moon, Mosby, Patterson, Rey, Turner, Valentino-Smith, M. Washington, K. Young, Kittleman, C. Howard, Afzali, Wilkins, Rose, Simonaire, Tarlau, Walker, Ali, and Hornberger
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, State Department of
Hearings
Judges
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Public Schools
Reports
Special Education
Sunset
Teachers
Tuition
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:05 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Ways and Means
2/14/20172/14/2017Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20173/16/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20173/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {365065/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/17/20173/14/2017Third Reading Passed (138-0)48
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20173/29/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/3/2017Favorable with Amendments {164239/1 Report Adopted63A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments63A
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted63A
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-0)63A
House4/10/20174/5/2017House Concur - Senate Amendments70
Third Reading Passed (133-0)70
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 715

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:05 P.M.