HB1254 (CH0775)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education – School Discipline – Data Collection

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, A.

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education to disaggregate the information in any student discipline data reports by race, ethnicity, gender, disability status, eligibility for free or reduced price meals or an equivalent measure of socioeconomic status, and English language proficiency; requiring that special education data in a certain student discipline data report be disaggregated by race, ethnicity, and gender; and requiring the Department to collect certain data on alternative school discipline practices.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate A. Washington
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Discipline
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Special Education
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-306)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 21, 2018 10:42 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/14/20183/14/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/14/20183/11/2018Favorable with Amendments {515363/1 Report Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (115-21)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
3/19/20183/19/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 775

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:18 P.M.