HB1342 (CH0525)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Government – Discrimination and Harassment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Kelly

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525


Synopsis:Altering the training course that the State Ethics Commission is required to provide for regulated lobbyists and prospective regulated lobbyists; prohibiting a certain State official from unlawfully harassing or discriminating against certain individuals; requiring the Joint Ethics Committee to provide a copy of a certain complaint and notice to the Human Resources Manager of the Department of Legislative Services; requiring the Legislative Policy Committee to update a certain antiharassment policy and include a certain provision; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Kelly, Fraser-Hidalgo, Krimm, Barve, Robinson, Adams, Ali, Angel, Atterbeary, Aumann, Barkley, Barron, Beidle, Brooks, Carey, Carozza, Carr, Cassilly, Chang, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Flanagan, Frick, Frush, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glenn, Grammer, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jameson, Kipke, Kittleman, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Krebs, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Long, Luedtke, McComas, McCray, McIntosh, McKay, McMillan, Miele, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morgan, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reilly, Reznik, Rose, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Simonaire, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, K. Young, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB1138
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Rules and Executive Nominations  View Committee HearingRules
Broad Subject(s):State Government - General Assembly
Ethics
Human Relations
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Discipline
Discrimination
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Emergency Bills
Ethics
General Assembly -see also- AELR Cmte; Leg Policy Committee
Harassment -see also- Threats
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Legislative Services, Department of
Lobbying
Notices
Privacy
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Time
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(5-101, 5-205, 5-517, 5-518, 5-714, 5-508, 5-518.1, 5-714.1)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(7-239)
Article - State Government
(2-1201, 2-1211, 2-1215, 2-401, 2-407, 2-701, 2-706)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 11:39 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2/21/20182/21/2018Hearing 3/05 at 3:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {583221/1 Report Adopted47
Floor Amendment {663926/1 (Delegate Healey) Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (138-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Senate Rules48B
3/29/20183/29/2018Hearing 3/30 at 11:00 a.m.
Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/30 at 12:30 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {573720/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/9/20184/2/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments67
Third Reading Passed (140-0)67
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 525

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:34 P.M.