HB1349 (CH0374)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Environment - Compostable, Degradable, and Biodegradable Plastic Products - Labeling

Sponsored by:

Delegate Robinson

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374


Synopsis:Prohibiting a person from selling a specified plastic product that is labeled as biodegradable, degradable, or decomposable on or after October 1, 2018, subject to a specified exception; prohibiting a person from selling a specified plastic product labeled as compostable or home compostable on or after October 1, 2018, unless the plastic product meets specified standards; establishing specified penalties; providing for the disposition of specified penalties collected under the Act; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Robinson
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Finance
Broad Subject(s):Environment
Narrow Subject(s):Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Fines -see also- Penalties and Sentences
Food -see also- Kosher; Meat, Poultry, Seafood; Milk
Labeling
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Recycling
Statutes:Article - Environment
(9-2101 through 9-2105)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters
2/13/20172/13/2017Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
3/17/20173/17/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/17/20173/14/2017Favorable with Amendments {830918/1 Report Adopted48
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 48
3/18/20173/15/2017Second Reading Passed with Amendments49
3/20/20173/17/2017Third Reading Passed (120-8)51
Senate3/20/20173/17/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance46A
3/22/20173/22/2017Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
4/10/20174/10/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/10/20174/2/2017Favorable Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed62
4/10/20174/3/2017Third Reading Passed (33-14)63A
House4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed69
Post Passage5/4/20175/4/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:06 P.M.