HB1400 (CH0307)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program – Employees of Qualifying Organizations

Sponsored by:

Delegate Morhaim

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307


Synopsis:Providing that participation by certain organizations in the State employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program may not impede, undermine, or conflict with certain obligations or statuses; authorizing an employee of a county board to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program; establishing the Task Force to Study Cooperative Purchasing for Health Insurance; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2020; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Morhaim, McIntosh, Angel, Arentz, Atterbeary, Aumann, B. Barnes, Barve, Beitzel, Brooks, Carr, Ciliberti, Clippinger, Cluster, Conaway, Corderman, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gibson, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, S. Howard, Jalisi, Jones, Kipke, Kittleman, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, Lierman, Lisanti, Luedtke, Malone, McComas, McCray, McKay, Moon, Proctor, Queen, Rey, Reznik, Saab, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, West, K. Young, P. Young, and A. Miller
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Appropriations  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Personnel
Local Government - Generally
Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Insurance Administration
Nonprofit Organizations
Reports
Retirement Systems -see also- Mandatory Retirement
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
State Employees
Sunset
Statutes:Article - State Personnel and Pensions
(2-501, 2-502, 2-503, 2-512, 2-513)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 3:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Appropriations
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/01 at 1:15 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {884463/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation48B
3/23/20183/21/2018Reassigned to Finance52
3/26/20183/26/2018Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {447279/1 Report Adopted62A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62A
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/31/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (138-0)65
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/24/20184/24/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 24, 2018 2:56 P.M.