HB1403 (CH0033)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Next Generation Scholars of Maryland

Sponsored by:

Delegate McIntosh

Status:

Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33


Synopsis:Altering the criteria for the prequalification of a student for the Guaranteed Access Grant; changing the name of the College Readiness Outreach Program to be the Next Generation Scholars of Maryland Program; providing that the purpose of the Program is to provide guidance and services to specified students who qualify for a Guaranteed Access Grant; requiring the Governor to provide $5,000,000 in general funds in the State budget for fiscal years 2018 through 2023 for the Program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates McIntosh, A. Washington, McCray, McKay, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Cullison, Ebersole, Frick, Frush, Glenn, Haynes, Hill, Hixson, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Lafferty, Lam, Luedtke, Morhaim, B. Robinson, Valentino-Smith, M. Washington, and P. Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1170
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Commerce and Business -see also- Dealers; Elec. Comm.; etc.
Counselors -see also- Social Workers
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, State Department of
Grants
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Language
Mentors
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(18-303, 18-303.1)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(6-226)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Ways and Means
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20163/17/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/17/20163/15/2016Favorable with Amendments {105962/1 Report Adopted47
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted 47
3/18/20163/16/2016Floor Amendment (Delegate McMillan) {193721/1 Rejected (46-88)48
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48
3/19/20163/17/2016Third Reading Passed (88-44)49
Senate3/21/20163/19/2016First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48A
3/28/20163/28/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/20163/24/2016Favorable with Amendments {104036/253
Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted53
3/29/20163/25/2016Favorable with Amendments {104036/2 Report Adopted54
Second Reading Passed with Amendments54
3/30/20163/26/2016Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-11)55
House3/31/20163/26/2016House Concur - Senate Amendments58A
Third Reading Passed (88-46)58A
Passed Enrolled58A
Post Passage4/8/20164/8/2016Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:06 P.M.