HB1415 (CH0361)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education

Sponsored by:

Speaker

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with certain entities, to establish an outreach program and a certain digital recruitment platform to make use of certain media and online resources to implement a marketing campaign to encourage certain individuals to pursue a Maryland professional teacher's certificate; establishing the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education Fund to assist in providing adequate funding for early childhood, primary, and secondary education in the State; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The Speaker (By Request - Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education) and Delegates Kaiser, McIntosh, Jones, A. Washington, Luedtke, and Lierman
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1092
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Higher Education
Education - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Apprentices
Appropriations
Assessments
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Community Colleges
Comptroller
Curriculum
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Demographics -see also- Census; Data
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Electronic Communication -see also- Comm; Elec.Gov; Lang; Te
Grants
Industry and Technology
Job Training -see also- Continuing Education
Licenses -see also- Alcoholic Bev Lic; Drivers' Licenses
Literacy
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Teachers
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Statutes:Article - Education
(18-2201, 18-2202, 18-2203, 18-2204, 18-2205 through 18-2208, 18-2209, 18-2210, 7-101.2, 7-1702, 7-1704, 21-205, 2-306, 5-216, 5-219, 7-2001 through 7-2006)
Article - State Finance and Procurement
(6-226)
Article - Tax - General
(2-606, 2-605.1)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2016, 2017)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 2:24 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means and Appropriations
2/20/20182/20/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
3/15/20183/15/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/15/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments {385964/1 Report Adopted46
Second Reading Passed with Amendments46
3/16/20183/13/2018Third Reading Passed (114-22)47
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation48A
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {434234/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/31/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (113-25)65
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.