HB1456 (CH0626)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Offshore Drilling Liability Act

Sponsored by:

Delegate Barve

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626


Synopsis:Expanding the definition of "offshore drilling activity" to mean the exploration, development, production or transportation of oil or gas on or under the outer continental shelf; establishing that an offshore drilling activity is an ultrahazardous and abnormally dangerous activity; establishing that a person that causes a spill of oil or gas while engaged in an offshore drilling activity is strictly liable for certain damages; providing that provisions concerning a certain bond do not apply to a judgment in a certain civil action; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Barve, Beidle, Carr, Flanagan, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Knotts, Lafferty, Platt, Robinson, and Stein
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1128
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Civil Actions and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Bonds -see also- County & Baltimore City Bonds; State Bonds
Civil Actions -see also- Small Claims
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Damages
Fuel -see also- Coal
Judgments
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Wells -see also- Hydraulic Fracturing
Statutes:Article - Courts and Judicial Proceedings
(12-301.1, 3-2101 through 3-2104)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 18, 2018 4:03 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary and Environment and Transportation
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable Report by Judiciary
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed47
3/19/20183/14/2018Third Reading Passed (115-22)48
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48B
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments {548173/1 Report Adopted60
Floor Amendment {423121/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61A
Third Reading Passed (115-21)61A
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:17 P.M.