HB1468

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Transit - Job Access and Reverse Commute (JARC) Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Beidle

Status:

In the House - Returned Passed


Synopsis:Establishing the Job Access and Reverse Commute Program in the Maryland Transit Administration; authorizing the Administration to make certain grants under the Program to certain providers for certain employment and commuter projects; providing for the distribution of funds under the Program; requiring the Administration to conduct certain solicitations before accepting grant applications under the Program; requiring the Governor to provide up to $400,000 annually in the State budget for the Program; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate Beidle
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee HearingFinance  View Committee Hearing
Budget and Taxation
Broad Subject(s):Transportation - Generally
Narrow Subject(s):Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Commuters -see also- Car Pools
For-Hire Driving -see also- Taxicabs
Grants
Mass Transit -see also- Buses; Railroads
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Welfare -see also- Social Services
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(7-1101 through 7-1108)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 30, 2018 10:28 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
3/6/20183/6/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
3/17/20183/17/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
3/17/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {930015/1 Report Adopted47A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47A
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (136-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
4/6/20184/6/2018Favorable Report by Finance
4/6/20184/1/2018Favorable Report Adopted63
Second Reading Passed63
4/9/20184/2/2018Third Reading Passed (44-0)64
House4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 4:19 P.M.