HB1492

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Blue Ribbon Commission on School Transparency and Accountability

Sponsored by:

Delegate Washington, A.

Status:

In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules


Synopsis:Establishing the Blue Ribbon Commission on School Transparency and Accountability to study best practices for promoting ethics, accountability, and transparency in State and local government; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2019; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegate A. Washington
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingRules
Broad Subject(s):Education - Local Bills
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Communications -see also- Electronic Comm; Language; Telecom
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Disclosure
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Board of
Ethics
Investigations and Inquiries -see also- Crim Bckgrnd Invest
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials -see also- Atty Gen; Compt; Coun Admin; etc
Public Schools
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 10:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/29/20183/22/2018Favorable with Amendments {825967/1 Report Adopted56
Special Order until 3/30 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 56
3/30/20183/23/2018Floor Amendment {673028/2 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (52-84)57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
4/3/20183/25/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)59
Senate4/4/20183/30/2018First Reading Senate Rules61

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 4, 2018 11:12 A.M.