HB1507

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Compulsory School Attendance - Truancy Violations - Reporting of Neglect

Sponsored by:

Delegate Angel

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary


Synopsis:Requiring a school employee to report any person to the local department of social services for neglect of a child if the person has legal custody or care and control of a child who is between certain ages and fails to see that the child attends school or receives certain instruction; repealing certain provisions of law providing a criminal penalty for certain persons; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegate Angel
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Custody -see also- Parents and Guardians
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Family Law -see also- Adoption; Annulment; Divorce; etc
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Social Services -see also- Welfare
Teachers
Truancy
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-301)
Article - Family Law
(5-701, 5-704)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 2, 2018 10:22 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means
2/16/20182/16/2018Reassigned to Judiciary28
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Unfavorable Report by Judiciary

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 8, 2018 5:17 P.M.