HB1520

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - Personal Motor Vehicle Rentals

Sponsored by:

Delegate Flanagan

Status:

In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation


Synopsis:Establishing provisions of law governing the rental of personal motor vehicles to other persons in a specified manner; establishing that specified persons may rent only specified classes of personal motor vehicles to other persons; prohibiting a renter of a personal motor vehicle from using the motor vehicle for specified purposes; prohibiting a person from renting a personal motor vehicle to another person unless the motor vehicle is covered by specified security; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Flanagan and McCray
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1056
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Environment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Narrow Subject(s):Disclosure
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Leases and Rent
Motor Vehicles -see also- Aband Veh; Ambulances; Buses; etc.
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Insurance -see also- MD Auto Insurance Fund
Motor Vehicle Registration
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Residency -see also- Immigrants and Citizenship
Statutes:Article - Commercial Law
(13-301)
Article - Transportation
(18-101.1, 18-201 through 18-207)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 6, 2017 12:30 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation
2/13/20172/13/2017Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20173/27/2017Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 24, 2017 4:11 P.M.