HB1607 (CH0565)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Juvenile Services Education Programs - Management and Operation

Sponsored by:

Delegate Luedtke

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565


Synopsis:Establishing the Juvenile Services Education County Pilot Program to pilot a management model where a juvenile services education program at a facility located in a county is operated by the county board of education; requiring the Program to begin in the 2019-2020 school year; requiring the State Department of Education to identify one juvenile services education program to participate in the Program; requiring a certain workgroup to make recommendations on the management and operation of juvenile services education programs; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Luedtke, Hettleman, Tarlau, Lierman, Queen, Valentino-Smith, Jones, Sydnor, Lisanti, A. Miller, Korman, K. Young, Krimm, Morhaim, and Jackson
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee Hearing
Judiciary
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Administrative Agencies -see also- Electronic Government
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Contracts -see also- Land Installment Contracts; Procurement
Curriculum
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Health, Department of
Juvenile Services, Department of
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
State Aid
Students
Teachers
Youth -see also- Minors
Statutes:Article - Education
(6-302, 22-308)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 21, 2018 11:29 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Ways and Means and Judiciary
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {855962/1 Report Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (138-0)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs48B
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/4/20184/4/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/20183/31/2018Favorable with Amendments {514039/1 Report Adopted62
Second Reading Passed with Amendments62
4/6/20184/1/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)63
House4/7/20183/31/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments65
Third Reading Passed (137-0)65
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 565

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:37 P.M.