HB1638

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Information Act - Revisions

Sponsored by:

Delegate Sydnor

Status:

In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Providing that, except as otherwise provided by law, the Public Information Act does not authorize a custodian of records to allow the inspection of the Social Security number or date of birth of an individual except to a person in interest; requiring, except under certain circumstances, a custodian to deny inspection of a certain part of a personal surveillance video; requiring that a victim who is the subject of a record that is denied inspection be notified of all requests to inspect the record; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Delegates Sydnor, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gibson, J. Lewis, McComas, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Reilly, and Sample-Hughes
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB0788
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee Hearing
Judiciary
Broad Subject(s):State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Death -see also- Advance Medical Directives; Wrongful Death
Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Legislation -see also- Correct Leg; Cur Leg; Emerg Bills
Municipal Corporations -see also- Annap; Balt; Hager; OC
News Media
Notices
Police Training Commission
Privacy
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Information
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Sexual Offenses
Social Security
State Employees
Victims -see also- Criminal Injuries Compensation
Video
Statutes:Article - General Provisions
(4-101, 4-103, 4-327.1, 4-341)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 8, 2018 10:19 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2/14/20182/14/2018Hearing canceled (Judiciary)
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
4/7/20184/7/2018Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 6, 2018 5:46 P.M.