HB1646

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Criminal Procedure - Firearms - Transfer

Sponsored by:

Delegate Atterbeary

Status:

In the Senate - Passed Enrolled


Synopsis:Requiring a State's Attorney to serve a written notice on a certain defendant, defendant's counsel, and the court prior to trial or the acceptance of a guilty plea or the equivalent; requiring a court to inform, verbally or in writing, a defendant convicted of a certain offense that the defendant is prohibited from possessing certain firearms and is ordered to transfer certain firearms in accordance with the Act; authorizing the court to issue a search warrant based on probable cause that certain weapons have not been surrendered; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Atterbeary, Ali, Anderson, Angel, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, Jalisi, Jameson, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, Wilson, K. Young, P. Young, and Flanagan
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1036
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judiciary  View Committee HearingJudicial Proceedings
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Procedure
Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Courts -see also- Circuit; Appeals; District; Orphans'; etc.
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Dealers -see also- Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Domestic Violence -see also- Child Abuse & Neglect
Evidence
Guns
Law Enforcement -see also- State Police, Department of
Notices
Process Serving
Rules and Regulations
Search and Seizure
State's Attorneys
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Warrants
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(4-303)
Article - Criminal Procedure
(6-234)
Article - Public Safety
(3-207, 5-133, 5-205)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 16, 2018 3:16 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary
2/12/20182/12/2018Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {622411/1 Report Adopted44
Special Order until next session (Delegate Saab) Adopted 44
3/14/20183/11/2018Floor Amendment {573523/1 (Delegate Vogt) Rejected (44-87)45
Floor Amendment {403126/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (46-89)45
Floor Amendment {363822/1 (Delegate Flanagan) Adopted45
Second Reading Passed with Amendments45
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (129-5)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings48A
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
4/3/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments {208176/1 Report Adopted60
Second Reading Passed with Amendments60
4/4/20183/30/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)61
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments61
House Requests Senate Recede61
Conference Committee Appointed61
Delegates Moon, Queen, and Malone61
Senate4/6/20184/1/2018Senate Refuses to Recede63
Conference Committee Appointed63
Senators Zirkin, Ready, and Muse63
House4/9/20184/1/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted66
Third Reading Passed (135-4)66
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Conference Committee Report Adopted65
Third Reading Passed (45-0)65
House4/9/20184/1/2018Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 3:52 P.M.