HB1782 (CH0037)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Health Insurance - Individual Market Stabilization (Maryland Health Care Access Act of 2018)

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pena-Melnyk

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37


Synopsis:Requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, health maintenance organizations, managed care organizations, dental plans, and certain entities or persons to be subject to a certain assessment in calendar year 2019; providing the assessment's purpose to recoup the aggregate amount of a certain insurer provider fee as a bridge to stability in the individual health insurance market; requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to distribute the assessment to the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Angel, Barron, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kelly, Morales, Platt, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, K. Young, R. Lewis, and A. Miller
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingFinance
Broad Subject(s):Insurance - Health
Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Comptroller
Dentists
Emergency Bills
Federal Government
Health -see also- Mental and Behavioral Health
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Health Maintenance Organizations -see also- Manage Care Orgs
Income Tax
Insurance Administration
Liability -see also- Good Samaritan
Medical Assistance
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Tax Credits
Tax Returns
Time
Statutes:Article - Insurance
(15-1202, 15-1301, 6-102.1)
Article - Chapter of the Acts
(2017)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 25, 2018 11:10 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House2/28/20182/28/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/2/20183/5/2018Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/16/20183/13/2018Favorable with Amendments {226683/1 Report Adopted47
Floor Amendment {443622/1 (Delegate R. Lewis) Adopted47
Second Reading Passed with Amendments47
3/19/20183/15/2018Third Reading Passed (91-47)49
Senate3/19/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48B
3/21/20183/21/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
3/29/20183/29/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
3/29/20183/26/2018Favorable with Amendments {277275/1 Report Adopted57
Second Reading Passed with Amendments57
3/30/20183/27/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (40-6)58
House4/5/20183/27/2018House Concur - Senate Amendments61
Third Reading Passed (89-48)61
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage4/10/20184/10/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 37

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 10, 2018 12:59 P.M.