HB1786

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Higher Education - Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship - Establishment

Sponsored by:

Delegate Jackson

Status:

In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)


Synopsis:Establishing the Richard W. Collins III Leadership With Honor Scholarship Program; establishing eligibility criteria that require an individual to be a member of the Reserve Officer Training Corps, a certain minority student, and a student at a historically black college or university in the State; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission to award 25% of its grant money to students at Bowie State University and 75% to certain other colleges and universities; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Jackson, Proctor, Valentino-Smith, Fisher, A. Washington, Ali, Wilkins, D. Barnes, Patterson, Ebersole, Luedtke, Tarlau, Mosby, and Turner
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: SB1202
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Committee(s):
Ways and Means  View Committee HearingEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Broad Subject(s):Higher Education
Narrow Subject(s):Appropriations
Armed Forces -see also- Military Department; Veterans
Higher Education -see also- Comm Colleges; Med Schools; etc.
Higher Education Commission
Minorities -see also- Women
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Statutes:Article - Education
(18-605)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 11:27 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House3/1/20183/1/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/20184/2/2018Rereferred to Ways and Means
4/2/20184/2/2018Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {915667/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)62
Senate4/6/20184/1/2018First Reading Senate Rules63
4/9/20184/9/2018Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/20184/4/2018Favorable Report Adopted66
Floor Amendment {753424/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted66
Second Reading Passed with Amendments66
4/9/20184/5/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)67

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 11:19 P.M.