HB1795 (CH0006)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a Reinsurance Program

Sponsored by:

Delegate Pena-Melnyk

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6


Synopsis:Altering the purposes of the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Fund; providing that certain funds may be used only for the purposes of the State Reinsurance Program; requiring, rather than authorizing, the Exchange, in consultation with the Maryland Insurance Commission and as approved by the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange Board, to establish and implement a State Reinsurance Program to provide reinsurance to certain carriers; requiring that the Program be designed to mitigate the impact of certain individuals on rates; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Busch, Angel, B. Barnes, Barron, Bromwell, Frush, Hill, Kelly, Kipke, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Reznik, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Szeliga, Valentino-Smith, West, K. Young, Cullison, Hayes, Krebs, Morales, Platt, and Saab
Additional Facts:Bill is an Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Committee(s):
Health and Government Operations  View Committee HearingFinance
Broad Subject(s):Insurance - Health
Narrow Subject(s):Emergency Bills
Federal Government
Health Benefit Exchange
Health Insurance -see also- HMOS; Managed Care Organizations
Insurance Administration
Medical Assistance
Prices -see also- Consumer Price Index
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Rules and Regulations
Statutes:Article - Insurance
(31-107, 31-117, 31-117.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 12, 2018 1:36 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
House3/2/20183/2/2018First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
3/5/20183/5/2018Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
3/7/20183/7/2018Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
3/12/20183/12/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
3/13/20183/10/2018Favorable with Amendments {906685/1 Report Adopted44
Floor Amendment {583825/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted44
Second Reading Passed with Amendments44
3/15/20183/12/2018Third Reading Passed (135-0)46A
Senate3/16/20183/16/2018First Reading Finance48A
3/22/20183/22/2018Favorable Report by Finance
3/22/20183/20/2018Favorable Report Adopted51
Second Reading Passed51
3/23/20183/21/2018Third Reading Passed (43-4)52
House3/26/20183/19/2018Returned Passed53
Post Passage4/5/20184/5/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2018 10:52 A.M.