Health and Government Operations Committee, Chair

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 15)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0824 / CH0823
    (SB0548 / CH0824)
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 823Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1265 / CH0218
    (SB0549 / CH0217)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 218Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - OtherHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0123 / CH0720Health Insurance - Required Conformity With Federal LawApproved by the Governor - Chapter 720Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0127 / CH0103Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Board of Review - RepealApproved by the Governor - Chapter 103Health and Government Operations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB0128 / CH0211State Disabilities Plan and Interagency Disabilities Board - RevisionsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalDisabled (O3)
HB0132 / CH0208Long-Term Care Ombudsman Program - RegulationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 208Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalElderly (O2)
HB0144 / CH0108Procurement - Department of General Services - Exemption for Historic StructuresApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0145 / CH0109Board of Examiners of Nursing Home Administrators - Nonlicensed Persons - Provisional LicensureApproved by the Governor - Chapter 109Health and Government Operations
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0146 / CH0110Secretary of Aging - Administration of Commodity Supplemental Food Program and Regulatory AuthorityApproved by the Governor - Chapter 110Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalElderly (O2)
HB0147 / CH0206Healthy Aging ProgramApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206Health and Government OperationsFinance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalElderly (O2)
HB0148 / CH0111State Archives - Care of Fine Art or Decorative Art - Procurement ExemptionApproved by the Governor - Chapter 111Health and Government Operations
1/26/2017 - 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0154 / CH0113Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration DateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Health and Government Operations
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalInsurance - Health (C3)
HB0747 / CH0139Public Health - Cigarette Restitution Fund Programs - ModificationsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 139Health and Government Operations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)
HB1432 / CH0570Health Care Providers - Prescription Opioids - Limits on Prescribing (The Prescriber Limits Act of 2017)Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570Health and Government Operations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/6/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1549Public Health - Drug Overdose Prevention Programs - RevisionsIn the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - DepartmentalPublic Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:19 P.M.