Homeowners Associations

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0320Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association StandingDelegate SydnorIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0413Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendment of Governing DocumentsDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0472
    (SB0493)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)Delegate SteinIn the House - Hearing canceledEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0481
    (SB0681)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Seneca Park NorthDelegate BarkleyIn the House - First Reading AppropriationsAppropriationsState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0564
    (SB0432)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing BodiesDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0575Condominiums - Suspension of Use of Common ElementsDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0602Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging EquipmentDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0669Real Property - Homeowners Associations - Definition of LotDelegate BeidleIn the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1007
    (SB0883)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesDelegate CullisonIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1066Homeowners Associations - Recorded Covenants or Restrictions - Deletion of Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National OriginDelegate WestIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1097
    (SB0931)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute SettlementDelegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1158Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersDelegate HolmesIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0065Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0095Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Voting, Records, and Conflicts of InterestSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0216Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Priority of Liens - Included ChargesSenator NormanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0432
    (HB0564)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing BodiesSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0493
    (HB0472)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Collectible Rent (Rent Transparency Act)Senator NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0621Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National OriginSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0681
    (HB0481)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Seneca Park NorthSenator KingIn the Senate - First Reading Budget and TaxationBudget and TaxationState Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0777Aquaculture Leases - Notice - Homeowners AssociationsSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0883
    (HB1007)
Homeowners Association Act - Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, Recordation, and RulesSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0931
    (HB1097)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute SettlementSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

February 19, 2018 9:52 A.M.