Prince George's County Delegation

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33 (Primary Sponsor: 0, Co-sponsor: 0, By Request: 33)

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
TitleStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Sponsorship
Type
 
Broad Subject
HB0570Prince George's County - Emergency Medical Services - Motorcycle Unit PG 305-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteePublic Safety (E4)
HB0593Prince George's County - Public Schools - Criteria for Building Surveys and Inspections PG 409-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriationsBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0594Prince George's County - New School Construction Investment Act of 2015 PG 413-15In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0597
    (SB0867)
Prince George's County Board of Education - Public High Schools - Outdoor Synthetic Turf Fields PG 407-15In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0598 / CH0099Prince George's County - Raffles - Charitable Foundations PG 301-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeGaming (C7)
HB0607Prince George's County - Property Tax - Transforming Neighborhood Initiative Residential Rehabilitation Tax Credit PG 414-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0609Prince George's County - Motorcycle Operators - Penalties for Speed Violations PG 311-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0617 / CH0264Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses, Salaries, Inspectors, and Bottle Clubs PG 307-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 264Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0632Prince George's County - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicles - Penalty for Highway Use PG 312-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0634 / CH0445Prince George's County Board of Education - Authority to Establish a Certified County-Based Business Participation Program PG 408-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 445Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0649 / CH0265Prince George's County - Clean Water Program - Report PG 404-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 265Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0654Prince George's County - Unattended Motor Vehicle - Exception to Prohibition PG 313-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0671Task Force on the Creation of a Juvenile Assessment Center and Constructive Alternatives to Managing Youth at Risk of Delinquency in Prince George's County PG 306-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0681 / CH0267Prince George's County - Municipal Tax Setoff - Report PG 417-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0704Prince George's County - Authority to Prohibit the Use of Disposable Bags PG 403-15In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic MattersEnvironment and Transportation
Economic Matters
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0705 / CH0101Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Penalties PG 304-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0706Prince George's County - Alternatives to Suspension Pilot Program - Establishment PG 412-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0707 / CH0451Prince George's County - Board of Education - Issuance of Credit Cards - Prohibition PG 411-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 451Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0709Prince George's County - Authority to Impose Fees for Use of Disposable Bags PG 416-15In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic MattersEnvironment and Transportation
Economic Matters
By Request - CommitteeCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0710Prince George's County - School Property - Development of Policy for Noneducational Use PG 406-15In the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0851
    (SB0423 / CH0031)
Alcoholic Beverages - Towne Centre at Laurel - Class A License PG 316-15Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0912Prince George's County Juvenile Court and School Safety Workgroup PG 314-15In the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0927Prince George's County - Homestead Property Tax Credit Percentage PG 422-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0929
    (SB0756)
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15In the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeReal Property (N1)
HB0930Prince George's County - Board of License Commissioners - Membership PG 315-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0931 / CH0111Alcoholic Beverages - Prince George's County - Seven Day Sales PG 318-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0932
    (SB0369 / CH0345)
Prince George's County - City of College Park - Class D Beer and Wine License PG 317-15Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0935 / CH0289Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15Approved by the Governor - Chapter 289Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
By Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0937
    (SB0645)
Prince George's County - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation Requirements PG 421-15In the House - Hearing cancelledWays and MeansBy Request - CommitteeEducation - Local Bills (F3)
HB0983Prince George's Community College - Certified County-Based Business Participation Program PG 405-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsBy Request - CommitteeCommunity Colleges - Local Bills (F4)
HB1004
    (SB0313)
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Underage Individuals at Special Entertainment Events PG 319-15In the House - Hearing cancelledEconomic MattersBy Request - CommitteeAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1034Prince George's County - Public Ethics - Governing Bodies of Municipal Corporations Exercising Zoning Authority PG 420-15In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationBy Request - CommitteeEthics (G2)
HB1177Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationBy Request - CommitteeTaxes - Property (Q1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:40 P.M.