Real Estate/Agents and Brokers

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number/Chapter
(Cross File/Chapter)
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0106Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society StatusDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0747 / CH0276
    (SB0539)
Real Estate Brokers - Licensure Requirement - Exemption for LawyersDelegate GilchristApproved by the Governor - Chapter 276Economic Matters
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0759Home Act of 2016Delegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0936Real Estate Brokers - Licensing - Continuing Education RequirementsDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0989 / CH0638
    (SB0815)
Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer ChargesDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 638Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1171Foreclosed Property Registry - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property, Registration Requirement, and Access to RegistryDelegate LisantiIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1274
    (SB0836)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1421Real Property - Real Estate Sales Contracts - Required NoticeDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1453 / CH0433
    (SB0824 / CH0432)
Real Estate Licensees - Verification of Service Provider Licensing StatusDelegate VaughnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1469 / CH0311
    (SB0828)
Real Estate Brokers - Agency Relationships in Residential Real Estate Transactions - Disclosure and Consent RequirementsDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Economic Matters
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0539
    (HB0747 / CH0276)
Real Estate Brokers - Licensure Requirement - Exemption for LawyersSenator ConwayVeto sustained (0-46)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0815
    (HB0989 / CH0638)
Residential Real Property - Sales Contracts - Notice of Water and Sewer ChargesSenator MuseIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0824 / CH0432
    (HB1453 / CH0433)
Real Estate Licensees - Verification of Service Provider Licensing StatusSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 432Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0828
    (HB1469 / CH0311)
Real Estate Brokers - Agency Relationships in Residential Real Estate Transactions - Disclosure and Consent RequirementsSenator ConwayVeto sustained (0-46)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0836
    (HB1274)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 18, 2017 12:30 P.M.