SB0001 (CH0728)

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Education - Specialized Intervention Services - Reports

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728


Synopsis:Requiring county boards of education, beginning in the 2018-2019 school year, to report specified information relating to the provision of specialized intervention services to the State Department of Education and the General Assembly on or before December 1 each year; requiring county boards and the Department to publish annually this same information on their Web sites; requiring the Department to establish guidelines for the report that each county board is required to submit regarding specialized intervention services; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Senators Conway, Madaleno, Lee, Zucker, and Smith
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0286
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Budgets -see also- Capital Budgets
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Public Information
Records -see also- Land Records; Vital Records
Reports
Statutes:Article - Education
(5-111.1)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate6/29/20166/29/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/6/20171/6/2017Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
1/12/20171/12/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
2/9/20172/9/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/20172/13/2017Favorable with Amendments {734736/1 Report Adopted22
Second Reading Passed with Amendments22
2/15/20172/15/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)24
House2/15/20172/15/2017First Reading Ways and Means26
3/1/20173/1/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/3/20173/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {845762/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed with Amendments (121-17)62
Senate4/6/20173/31/2017Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments60
Senate Requests House Recede60
Conference Committee Appointed60
Senators Pinsky, Zucker, and Bates60
House4/10/20174/3/2017Motion Recede (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted68
House Recede68
Third Reading Passed (120-19)68
Senate4/10/20174/4/2017Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/25/20175/25/2017Approved by the Governor - Chapter 728

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:08 P.M.