SB0015

Find a 2015 Bill:

2015 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

Veto sustained (0-46)


Synopsis:Establishing the Task Force to Study the Implementation of a Dyslexia Education Program; providing for the composition of the Task Force including one representative each from the Public School Superintendents Association of Maryland, the Maryland State Education Association, and the Maryland School Psychologists' Association; requiring the Task Force to study specified matters and to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 30, 2015, to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Conway, Pinsky, Bates, Kagan, Montgomery, Nathan-Pulliam, Rosapepe, Salling, Simonaire, Waugh, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0278
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0871 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Committees and Commissions -see also- Political Committees
Disabilities -see also- Blind; Deaf; Developmental
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Public Schools
Reports
Special Education
Students
Sunset
Statutes:

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:46 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate11/20/201411/20/2014Pre-filed
1/14/20151/14/2015First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/7/20151/7/2015Hearing 1/22 at 2:30 p.m.
1/26/20151/26/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/20151/27/2015Favorable with Amendments {114734/1 Report Adopted10
Second Reading Passed with Amendments10
1/29/20151/29/2015Third Reading Passed (44-0)12
House1/30/20151/30/2015First Reading Ways and Means13
3/10/20153/10/2015Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
3/17/20153/17/2015Hearing cancelled
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
3/27/20153/27/2015Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
3/27/20153/25/2015Favorable with Amendments {795762/1 Report Adopted55
Second Reading Passed with Amendments55
3/31/20153/27/2015Third Reading Passed with Amendments (135-1)57
Senate4/3/20153/29/2015Senate Concur - House Amendments56
Third Reading Passed (46-0)56
Passed Enrolled56
Post Passage5/12/20155/12/2015Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate1/13/20161/13/2016Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
1/21/20161/21/2016Veto sustained (0-46)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 4:46 P.M.