SB0038

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Motor Vehicle Administration – Birth Certificates – Issuance of Copies

Sponsored by:

Chair, Finance Committee

Status:

In the Senate - Returned Passed


Synopsis:Authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to access electronically from the Maryland Department of Health a copy of a birth certificate; authorizing the Administration to provide a copy of a birth certificate to a certain person under certain circumstances; authorizing the Administration to set and collect a fee for processing and issuing a birth certificate or for a certain report; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Electronic Government -see also- Electronic Communication
Federal Government
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Health, Department of
Identification
Motor Vehicle Administration
Reports
Vital Records
Statutes:Article - Health - General
(4-217)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 22, 2018 4:01 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/12/201710/12/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Finance
1/3/20181/3/2018Hearing 1/17 at 2:00 p.m.
1/10/20181/10/2018Hearing canceled
Hearing 1/17 at 1:30 p.m.
1/19/20181/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
1/22/20181/22/2018Favorable with Amendments {637173/1 Report Adopted9
Second Reading Passed with Amendments9
1/24/20181/24/2018Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Madaleno) Rejected (7-38)11
Third Reading Passed (44-0)11
House1/25/20181/25/2018First Reading Environment and Transportation12
2/27/20182/27/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/2/20184/2/2018Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/3/20183/25/2018Favorable Report Adopted59
Special Order until next session (Delegate Lam) Adopted 59
4/4/20183/26/2018Second Reading Passed60
4/7/20183/31/2018Third Reading Passed (137-0)65
Senate4/9/20184/3/2018Returned Passed65

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 3:25 P.M.