SB0043 (CH0373)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

High School Diploma by Examination - Eligibility Requirements - Exemption

Sponsored by:

Chair, Finance Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373


Synopsis:Exempting an individual from the requirement to not be subject to compulsory school attendance and to have withdrawn from school in order to be eligible to obtain a high school diploma by examination if the individual participates in a GED Option Program administered by the State Department of Education that creates a pathway to a high school diploma by examination for certain currently enrolled high school English language learner students under the age of 21 years.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Chair, Finance Committee and Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee (By Request - Departmental - Labor, Licensing and Regulation)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0193
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Finance  View Committee Hearing
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
Ways and Means
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Age of Majority -see also- Minors
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Language -see also- Communication; Electronic Comm; Telecomm
Minors -see also- Age of Majority; Youth
Private Schools
Public Schools
Students
Statutes:Article - Labor and Employment
(11-808)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 11, 2018 3:30 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate9/18/20179/18/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/3/20181/3/2018Hearing 1/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Finance)
1/29/20181/29/2018Favorable Report by Finance
1/30/20181/30/2018Favorable Report Adopted15
Second Reading Passed15
2/1/20182/1/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)17
House2/2/20182/2/2018First Reading Economic Matters and Ways and Means18
3/5/20183/5/2018Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
3/12/20183/12/2018Hearing canceled (Ways and Means)
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable Report by Economic Matters
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/6/20183/29/2018Third Reading Passed (132-0)63
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Returned Passed64
Post Passage5/8/20185/8/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 8, 2018 1:33 P.M.