SB0044

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Vehicle Laws - School Buses - Inspection, Repair, and Maintenance Requirements

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn


Synopsis:Requiring the owner of a school bus to ensure that the school bus is inspected, repaired, and maintained in accordance with certain federal regulations; prohibiting the owner of a school bus from allowing the school bus to be operated unless it meets the requirements of the Act; authorizing the Motor Vehicle Administration to suspend the registration of a school bus that does not meet the requirements of the Act; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Young
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Narrow Subject(s):Buses -see also- School Buses
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Safety -see also- Cybersecurity; Occupational Safety
Transportation -see also- Aircraft; Airports; Boats; etc
Statutes:Article - Transportation
(23-3A-01)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 17, 2018 4:23 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate11/3/201711/3/2017Pre-filed
1/10/20181/10/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/3/20181/3/2018Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20182/5/2018Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 2, 2018 10:24 A.M.