SB0083 (CH0529)

Find a 2016 Bill:

2016 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Safety - School Safety Enforcement Fund

Sponsored by:

Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529


Synopsis:Renaming the School Bus Safety Enforcement Fund to be the School Safety Enforcement Fund; expanding the purposes of the Fund to include enhancing school safety; requiring the Executive Director of the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to consider the geographic distribution of grant recipients before making a grant from the Fund; prohibiting a law enforcement agency or board of education from using a grant to fund the installation or maintenance of a speed monitoring system in or around a school zone; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Office of Crime Control and Prevention)
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingAppropriations  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Public Safety
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Education, Boards of
Grants
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Safety -see also- Occupational Safety
School Buses
Traffic Regulation
Statutes:Article - Public Safety
(4-201 through 4-204)
Article - Transportation
(17-106)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:07 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate9/29/20159/29/2015Pre-filed
1/13/20161/13/2016First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/6/20161/6/2016Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m.
1/7/20161/7/2016Hearing cancelled
1/13/20161/13/2016Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2/8/20162/8/2016Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/9/20162/9/2016Favorable with Amendments {658277/1 Report Adopted19
Second Reading Passed with Amendments19
2/11/20162/11/2016Third Reading Passed (47-0)21
House2/12/20162/12/2016First Reading Appropriations23
3/2/20163/2/2016Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20164/5/2016Favorable Report by Appropriations
4/5/20163/29/2016Favorable Report Adopted61
Second Reading Passed61
4/6/20163/30/2016Third Reading Passed (135-0)62
Senate4/7/20164/1/2016Returned Passed61
Post Passage5/19/20165/19/2016Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


October 24, 2017 5:07 P.M.