SB0090

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of Refusal

Sponsored by:

Senator Young

Status:

In the Senate - Second Reading Failed


Synopsis:Authorizing a student in a public school or nonpublic school to refuse to participate in or observe, in whole or in part, classwork or an assessment that includes specified actions conducted on a specified animal; authorizing a student to exercise a specified right of refusal on the day the classwork or assessment is scheduled to be performed; requiring a specified student to complete specified classwork or a specified assessment by an alternate educational method determined by a specified teacher for a specified purpose; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB1556
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0901 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Animals -see also- Birds; Dogs
Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Discrimination
Education, Boards of
Education -see also- Driver Ed; Higher Ed; Special Ed; etc
Education, State Department of
Examinations
Notices
Private Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Teachers
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-124)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate10/6/201610/6/2016Pre-filed
1/11/20171/11/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/6/20171/6/2017Hearing 1/25 at 2:00 p.m.
1/12/20171/12/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 1/25 at 3:00 p.m.
2/23/20172/23/2017Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/20172/24/2017Favorable with Amendments {714131/131
Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted31
2/27/20172/27/2017Favorable with Amendments {714131/1 Adopted32
Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (13-30)32
Second Reading Failed32

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.