SB0132

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Crimes - Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report

Sponsored by:

Senator Zirkin

Status:

In the House - First Reading Judiciary


Synopsis:Establishing that certain persons who are required to provide certain notice or make certain reports of suspected child abuse or neglect may not knowingly fail to give the notice or make the report if the person has actual knowledge of the abuse or neglect; establishing the misdemeanor of knowing failure to report child abuse or neglect under certain circumstances; and providing a penalty of a fine not to exceed $1,000 or imprisonment of up to 6 months or both for a violation of the Act.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Zirkin, Lee, Brochin, Cassilly, Hough, Kelley, Norman, Ramirez, Ready, and Smith
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0500
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0135 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Committee(s):
Judicial Proceedings  View Committee HearingJudiciary
Broad Subject(s):Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Family Law
Narrow Subject(s):Child Abuse and Neglect
Crimes and Punishments -see also- Penalties and Sentnc; etc.
Disclosure
Penalties and Sentences -see also- Death Penalty
Statutes:Article - Criminal Law
(3-602.2)
Article - Family Law
(5-704)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 13, 2018 10:18 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/11/20181/11/2018First Reading Judicial Proceedings
1/15/20181/15/2018Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2/5/20182/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2/6/20182/6/2018Favorable with Amendments {468177/1 Report Adopted20
Second Reading Passed with Amendments20
2/8/20182/8/2018Third Reading Passed (46-0)22
House2/9/20182/9/2018First Reading Judiciary23

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 9, 2018 11:13 A.M.