SB0134 (CH0571)

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Small Business Relief Tax Credit

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571


Synopsis:Authorizing a tax credit against the State income tax for certain small businesses that provide to qualified employees paid earned sick and safe leave that is paid at the same rate as the qualified employee normally earns and meets or exceeds certain requirements; making the credit refundable; providing that the total amount of tax credit certificates issued by the Department may not exceed $5,000,000 for any taxable year; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0099
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Income Tax
Notices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Small Business
Tax Credits
Time
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-746)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 18, 2018 3:53 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/11/20181/11/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {879233/1 Report Adopted48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {215566/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)62
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (44-0)64
Passed Enrolled
Post Passage5/15/20185/15/2018Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


May 15, 2018 1:16 P.M.