SB0134

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Small Business Relief Tax Credit

Sponsored by:

President

Status:

In the Senate - Passed Enrolled


Synopsis:Authorizing a tax credit against the State income tax for certain small businesses that provide certain employer benefits to qualified employees; providing for the calculation of the credit; requiring the Department of Commerce to issue a tax credit certificate under certain circumstances; providing that the total amount of tax credit certificates issued by the Department may not exceed a certain amount for each taxable year; requiring the Department to report certain information to the Comptroller; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
All Sponsors:The President (By Request - Administration)
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0099
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
By Request of the Governor
Committee(s):
Budget and Taxation  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Taxes - Income
Narrow Subject(s):Assessments
Commerce, Department of
Comptroller
Data -see also- Census; Demographics
Income Tax
Notices
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation -see also- Overtime; Reimb. Rates
Small Business
Tax Credits
Time
Work, Labor and Employment -see also- Col Barg; Holiday; etc
Statutes:Article - Tax - General
(10-746)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 17, 2018 11:40 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/11/20181/11/2018First Reading Budget and Taxation
1/31/20181/31/2018Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
3/16/20183/16/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Favorable with Amendments {879233/1 Report Adopted48A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments48A
3/19/20183/17/2018Third Reading Passed (47-0)48C
House3/20/20183/16/2018First Reading Ways and Means50
3/22/20183/22/2018Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
4/5/20184/5/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
4/5/20183/27/2018Favorable with Amendments {215566/1 Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed with Amendments61A
4/6/20183/28/2018Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)62
Senate4/9/20184/2/2018Senate Concur - House Amendments64
Third Reading Passed (44-0)64
Passed Enrolled

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 9, 2018 12:47 P.M.