SB0153

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public Schools - Length of School Year Adjustment - State of Emergency

Sponsored by:

Senator King

Status:

In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.


Synopsis:Authorizing a county board of education to adjust the length of the school year for up to 5 school days without applying for a specified waiver if normal school attendance is prevented because of conditions that require the Governor to declare a state of emergency; and prohibiting education funding from specified sources from being reduced under specified circumstances.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators King, DeGrange, Feldman, Guzzone, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Peters, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingWays and Means  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Narrow Subject(s):Counties -see also- Chartered Counties; Code Counties
Education, Boards of
Emergencies
Public Schools
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-103)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20171/16/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/20171/17/2017Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
1/20/20171/20/2017Hearing canceled
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
2/23/20172/23/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/20172/24/2017Favorable Report Adopted31
Second Reading Passed31
2/28/20172/28/2017Third Reading Passed (46-0)33
House3/1/20173/1/2017First Reading Ways and Means36
3/8/20173/8/2017Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


November 28, 2017 1:09 P.M.