SB0158

Find a 2017 Bill:

2017 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund

Sponsored by:

Senator Conway

Status:

In the Senate - Returned Passed


Synopsis:Altering the basis for calculating a specified license fee credited to the Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund; and extending the deadline from June 30, 2017 to June 30, 2019, by which the owner of a specified eligible heating oil tank may apply for reimbursement of specified costs from the Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senator Conway
Additional Facts:Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee HearingEnvironment and Transportation  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Environment
Narrow Subject(s):Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters -see also- Conserv; Nat Resrce; Pollut
Fees -see also- Attys' Fees; Devt Fees & Taxes; Reimb Rates
Fuel -see also- Coal
Hazardous and Toxic Substances -see also- Asbestos; Radiatn
Pollution -see also- Sediment Control
Revenue and Taxes -see also- Dev Fees &Taxes; specific tax
Statutes:Article - Environment
(4-411, 4-705)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


March 22, 2017 4:08 P.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/16/20171/16/2017First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/20171/17/2017Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
2/6/20172/6/2017Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/7/20172/7/2017Favorable Report Adopted18
Second Reading Passed18
2/9/20172/9/2017Third Reading Passed (45-1)20
House2/10/20172/10/2017First Reading Environment and Transportation23
3/6/20173/6/2017Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
4/3/20174/3/2017Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
4/3/20173/27/2017Favorable Report Adopted61A
Second Reading Passed61A
4/4/20173/28/2017Third Reading Passed (125-13)62
Senate4/5/20173/30/2017Returned Passed59

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


April 5, 2017 10:41 A.M.