SB0161

Find a 2018 Bill:

2018 Regular Session

 

Entitled:

Public and Nonpublic Schools - Student Sickle Cell Disease Management Programs

Sponsored by:

Senator Nathan-Pulliam

Status:

In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs


Synopsis:Requiring the State Department of Education and the Maryland Department of Health to establish certain guidelines for certain employees to utilize in the management of a student's sickle cell disease while the student is on the premises of a public or nonpublic school during certain hours and at school-sponsored activities, in collaboration with certain individuals; requiring a county board of education, on or before July 1, 2019, to establish a policy for public schools within its jurisdiction to utilize certain guidelines; etc.
Analysis:Fiscal and Policy Note
All Sponsors:Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Conway, Guzzone, Kelley, Madaleno, McFadden, Robinson, Rosapepe, and Young
Additional Facts:Cross-filed with: HB0622
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Committee(s):
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs  View Committee Hearing
Broad Subject(s):Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Narrow Subject(s):Diseases -see also- AIDS; Rabies
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health, Department of
Health Occupations -see also- specific health occupations
Jurisdiction
Parents and Guardians -see also- Adoption; Child Custody
Private Schools
Public Employees -see also- State Employees
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Statutes:Article - Education
(7-441)

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


January 29, 2018 9:18 A.M.
ChamberCalendar DateLegislative DateActionProceedings
Senate1/15/20181/15/2018First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/17/20181/17/2018Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2/19/20182/19/2018Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

How a Bill Becomes Law

Legislative Lingo

Explanation of Floor Motions and Actions


February 16, 2018 2:49 P.M.